Walsh, Joanna Clare (CPSO#: 96616)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Aug 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Cumiskey, Joanna Clare (used until: 26 Jul 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Wales, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Pathology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 34112
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 10 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 22 Aug 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Feb 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Joanna Clare Walsh may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Pathology,  University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. Walsh holds
                        an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of  registration  automatically  expires seven years from
                  the  date  of issuance or when Dr. Walsh  no longer  holds  the  academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives  a report indicating that Dr. Walsh's clinical
                        performance, knowledge,  skill,  judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee does not receive an  annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the  Committee  makes a decision about Dr. Walsh's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on  August  22,  2012, and expires on June 30,
                  2019.  Upon renewal of Dr. Walsh's academic appointment at the University
                  of  Western  Ontario,  the expiry date can be extended,  subject  to  the
                  limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.