Walsh, Mark Joseph (CPSO#: 78146)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 2004