Walsh, Scott Richard Albert (CPSO#: 74815)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Dermatology
M1 700
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4908
Fax: (416) 480-6897
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-7505
Fax: (416) 323-6254
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT RICHARD ALBERT WALSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005