Walters, Dana Marie (CPSO#: 85314)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
1106 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1C9
Phone: 226-674-4880
Fax: (519) 250-0150
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: 519-254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dana Walters Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Walters ( CPSO# 85314 )

Business Address:
202 - 1106 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1C9
Phone Number: (226) 674-4880

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Louisiana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nephrology Effective: 04 Jul 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jul 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANA MARIE WALTERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALTERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2007