Walters, Daniel James (CPSO#: 84076)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
21 Sylvan Street West
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue
Chatham, Ontario
Chatham ON  N7M5L9
Canada
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Walters Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Walters ( CPSO# 84076 )

Business Address:
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
21 Sylvan Street West
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Business Address:
5310 Explorer Drive
Mississauga ON  L4W 5H8

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Louisiana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 01 Mar 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL JAMES WALTERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALTERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2007