Walters, Thomas David (CPSO#: 79736)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Feb 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Western Australia, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Gastroenterology
Hepatology and Nutrition
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5143
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 24 Sep 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 25 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jan 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Thomas David Walters may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  University  of Toronto, in which Dr. Walters holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Walters no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.