Walton, Christine Cynthia (CPSO#: 82600)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
room 1 East 449
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-5267
Fax: 416-603-3437
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine Walton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Walton ( CPSO# 82600 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Hospital
Suite MG 314
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 3-434
Toronto ON  M5T 2S9
Phone Number: (416) 559-4559

Business Address:
Athletics Care Sports Medicine Centers
103 - 801 York Mills Road
North York ON  M3B 1X7
Phone Number: (416) 479-8377

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE CYNTHIA WALTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011