Walton, Kimberly Joyce (CPSO#: 82601)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Ext. 2900
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kim Walton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Walton ( CPSO# 82601 )

Business Address:
The Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY JOYCE WALTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012