Wang, Alex C (CPSO#: 90665)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alex Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 19 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Grand River Hospital, 835 King Street West, Kitchener, ON N2G 1G3
Instructions: St. Mary's Hospital, 911 Queen's Boulevard, Kitchener, ON N2M 1B2
Date Received: 29 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016