Wang, Ami Cheng Cheng (CPSO#: 93672)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pathology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232 Ext. 4936
Fax: (613) 533-2907
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ami C.C. Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wang ( CPSO# 93672 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pathology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 533-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMI CHENG CHENG WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2015