Wang, Angela Singwheay (CPSO#: 93744)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
20 Lynch St.
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA SINGWHEAY WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2015