Wang, Jodie Lynne Mary Calvert (CPSO#: 61291)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1990

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Wang, Jodie Lynne (used until: 14 Jun 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
#120-121 Charles St. W
Kitchener ON  N2M 2N4
Phone: (519) 618-9260
Fax: (226)647-5788
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

121 Charles St. W.
Kitchener ON  N2G 1H6
Canada
Phone: 519-618-9260
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jodie Calvert Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wang ( CPSO# 61291 )

Business Address:
120 - 121 Charles Street West
Kitchener ON  N2M 2N4
Phone Number: (519) 618-9260

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JODIE LYNNE MARY CALVERT WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1990

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)