Wang, Karen Kar Wai (CPSO#: 95337)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tyndale Counselling Services
3377 Bayview Avenue
B500 - Psychiatry clinic
Toronto ON  M2M 3S4
Phone: 4162186771
Fax: 4162186769
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2075 Bayview Avenue
Department of Psychiatry
F wing Room FG 30
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN KAR WAI WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017