Wang, Li (CPSO#: 89236)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:China Medical University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Biochemistry Effective: 22 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 23 Dec 2011 to 22 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 23 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Biochemistry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Dec 2013