Wang, Qiuyan (CPSO#: 92039)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Shanghai Second Medical College, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 11 Nov 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 12 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Oct 2011 to 03 Oct 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013