Wang, Tao (CPSO#: 92948)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pathology
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: 613-549-6666 Ext. 7491
Electoral District: 06

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAO WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2018