Wang, Yongjin (CPSO#: 79841)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Beijing Medical University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5115
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yongjin Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Wang ( CPSO# 79841 )

Business Address:
The Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Room 4F-396
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YONGJIN WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2008