Wania, Hormuzshaw Jamshed (CPSO#: 84097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Jun 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 592-2272
Fax: (905) 336-9627
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hormuzshaw Jamshed Wania Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Wania ( CPSO# 84097 )

Business Address:
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 592-2272

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 May 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Mar 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Hormuzshaw  Jamshed  Wania  may  practise medicine independently in family
            medicine, only.