Wanono, Revital (CPSO#: 86070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mississauga Lung Health Centre
Suite 214 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 848-6079
Fax: (905) 858-8835
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Revital Wanono Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wanono ( CPSO# 86070 )
Dr. D. Klein ( CPSO# 99666 )

Business Address:
Mississauga Lung Health Centre
214 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 848-6079

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 04 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REVITAL WANONO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANONO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2007 to 30 Apr 2007
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2013