Waraich, Ihsan Ullah (CPSO#: 91784)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:King Edward Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kennedy Medical Clinic
7990 Kennedy Road South,Unit 9
Brampton ON  L6W 0B3
Phone: (905) 455-5445
Fax: (905) 455-5665
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Excellent Cre Medical Centre
184 clarence street
Brampton ON  L6W 1T3
Canada
Phone: 905 230 6300
Fax: 905 230 6400
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

May Van Family Medicine and Walk In
Clinic
537 Van kirk Drive, Unit 104
Brampton ON  L7A 0C1
Canada
Phone: (905) 4955550
Fax: (905) 495-2624
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ihsan Waraich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Waraich ( CPSO# 91784 )

Business Address:
7990 Kennedy Road South
Suite 9
Brampton ON  L6W 0B3
Phone Number: (905) 455-5445

Business Address:
537 Van Kirk Drive
Suite 103
Brampton ON  L7A 0C1
Phone Number: (905) 455-5550


Corporation Name: Doctors Aziz, Cheema, and Waraich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 8 2018


Corporation Name: Doctors Hussaini and Waraich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hussaini ( CPSO# 99849 )
Dr. I. Waraich ( CPSO# 91784 )

Business Address:
May-Van Family Medicine and Walk-In
103 - 537 Van Kirk Drive
Brampton ON  L7A 0C1
Phone Number: (905) 495-5550

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Mar 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IHSAN ULLAH WARAICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARAICH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2012