Ward, Colin James (CPSO#: 77616)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite LL4
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 737-0363
Fax: (705) 737-2842
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bauman and Ward Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ward ( CPSO# 77616 )
Dr. S. Bauman ( CPSO# 79062 )

Business Address:
100 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 5K5
Phone Number: (705) 739-7667

Business Address:
LL4 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 737-0363

Business Address:
RVH Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
Barrie Endoscopy Clinic
5 Quarry Ridge Road
LL1
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 797-1112

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLIN JAMES WARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007