Ward, James Ryan (CPSO#: 93538)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Emergency Department
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Ward Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ward ( CPSO# 93538 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Emergency Department
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 410-1722

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 18 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES RYAN WARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2013