Ward, Richard (CPSO#: 89247)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jun 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Haematology
En 887
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5233
Fax: (416) 340-3799
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Ward Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ward ( CPSO# 89247 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Haematology
8N-887
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5233

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 16 Nov 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 May 2010
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 May 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Nov 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 May 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Nov 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Richard Ward may practise medicine independently in hematology.