Ward, Sarah Elizabeth (CPSO#: 88874)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
55 Queen Street East
Suite 804
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone: 416 864-5394
Fax: 416 864-5398
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah E. Ward Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ward ( CPSO# 88874 )

Business Address:
Suite 804
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 864-5394

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH WARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013