Warden, Julia Mary (CPSO#: 89209)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Fax: (416) 597-7107
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Omega Medical Associates
255 Consumers Rd, Suite 100
North York ON  M2J 1R4
Canada
Phone: 416-489-0711
Fax: 416-489-7009
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA MARY WARDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARDEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2013