Warder, Daniel Currie (CPSO#: 91595)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 203 1581 Hillside Avenue Victoria, BC V8T 2C1
Date Received: 29 Jan 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jan 2016