Warkentin, Joel David (CPSO#: 79360)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone: (807) 766-3370
Fax: (807) 766-3374
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL DAVID WARKENTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARKENTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2008