Warren, Jeffrey (CPSO#: 77837)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: Warren, Jeff (used until: 02 Feb 2010 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Box 222
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 73288
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Warren Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Warren ( CPSO# 77837 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Box 222
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY WARREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARREN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007