Warren, Thomas Andrew (CPSO#: 82482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 416
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M1M1
Phone: (905) 844-5346
Fax: (905) 849-6551
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas Warren Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Warren ( CPSO# 82482 )

Business Address:
416 - 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 31 Jul 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS ANDREW WARREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARREN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2009