Warsi, Mustafa Kamal (CPSO#: 81143)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
OakvilleTrafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-845-2571 Ext. 4800
Fax: 905-845-6419
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mustafa Warsi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Warsi ( CPSO# 81143 )
Dr. M. Hadi ( CPSO# 79957 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571


Corporation Name: Dr. Maha Hadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Warsi ( CPSO# 81143 )
Dr. M. Hadi ( CPSO# 79957 )

Business Address:
374 Lakeshore Road East
Mississauga ON  L5G 1H5
Phone Number: (905) 271-9000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 23 Apr 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUSTAFA KAMAL WARSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARSI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2007