Wasielesky, Lauren Miguens (CPSO#: 92032)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Fundacao Universidade Federal De Pelotas, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 13 Nov 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 14 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2011