Wasil, Bushra Iram (CPSO#: 89734)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Jan 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2404 N Courtenay PKWY
Merritt Island FL  32953
United States
Phone: (321) 453-3638

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - North Carolina

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 12 Jan 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 12 Jan 2016 Active View Details [+]

            As from January 12, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Bushra Iram Wasil, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Wasil to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Wasil has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario.