Wasowicz, Marcin (CPSO#: 81490)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jan 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Poznan, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Eaton North 3 Room 424
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3242
Fax: (416) 340-3698
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcin Wasowicz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wasowicz ( CPSO# 81490 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Eaton North 3 Room 424
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3242

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Poland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 16 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Marcin Wasowicz may practise medicine independently in anaesthesia, only.