Wassef, Lamia Fikry Fouad (CPSO#: 80979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
139 Greenbank Road
Suite 107
Ottawa ON  K2H 9A5
Phone: (613) 680-7602
Fax: (613) 680-7601
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Greenstreet Medical
16 Greeen Street
Ottawa ON  K2J 3R2
Canada
Phone: (613) 825-9799
Fax: (613) 825-5963
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1910 St. Laurent BLVD
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Canada
Phone: (613)523-5550
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lamia Wassef Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Wassef ( CPSO# 80979 )

Business Address:
Suite 107
139 Greenbank Road
Nepean ON  K2H 9A5
Phone Number: (613) 680-7602

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAMIA FIKRY FOUAD WASSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASSEF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2005