Wasserman, Lukas Johannes (CPSO#: 97908)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Stellenbosch, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St Josephs Healthcare 50 Charlton Avenue East Hamilton, ON L8N 4A6
Date Received: 27 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015