Wasserstein, David Nathan (CPSO#: 86696)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
2075 Bayview Avenue, Room MG301
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-5798
Fax: 416-480-5886
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 20
865 York Mills Road
North York ON  M3B1Y6
Canada
Phone: 6473497880
Fax: 6473497550
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Wasserstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wasserstein ( CPSO# 86696 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
Room MG 301
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5798

Business Address:
20 - 865 York Mills
Toronto ON  M3B 1Y6
Phone Number: (647) 349-7880

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID NATHAN WASSERSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASSERSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012