Wassif, Ehab Basha Abd El-Motagally (CPSO#: 88103)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4421 Queen Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 2L2
Phone: (905) 356-2236
Fax: (905) 356-2568
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 2N7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

230 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z2
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ehab Wassif, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Wassif ( CPSO# 88103 )

Business Address:
DMH 230 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
260 Sugar Loaf Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 2N7
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
4421 Queen Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 2L2
Phone Number: (905) 356-2236

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Feb 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EHAB BASHA ABD EL-MOTAGALLY WASSIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASSIF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2008 to 23 May 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 May 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2010