Wat, Shiu Yan Josephine (CPSO#: 84986)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC Juravinski Hospital Campus
Department of Radiology
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 43897
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek
Hamilton ON  L8J3W2
Canada
Phone: 9053874551
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 828-2066
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Norfolk General Hospital
365 West St
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T8
Canada
Phone: (519) 426-0130
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street E
Grimsby ON  L3M 5J5
Canada
Phone: (905) 945-2253
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Josephine Wat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wat ( CPSO# 84986 )

Business Address:
HHSC Henderson Campus
Department of Radiology
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 387-4551

Business Address:
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 5J5
Phone Number: (905) 945-2253

Business Address:
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone Number: (519) 426-0750

Business Address:
Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 828-2066

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 18 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIU YAN JOSEPHINE WAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 01 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 02 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2010