Waters, Eugenie Frances (CPSO#: 92919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carson Clinic
876 Montreal Road
unit E
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L3
Phone: (613) 742-8182
Fax: 613 742-0430
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

501 Smyth road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 78469
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Waters Duong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Duong ( CPSO# 90488 )
Dr. E. Waters ( CPSO# 92919 )

Business Address:
Carson Medical Clinic
Unit E
876 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L3
Phone Number: (613) 742-8182

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EUGENIE FRANCES WATERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012