Watkins, Jessica Anne (CPSO#: 91446)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: Collings, Jessica Anne (used until: 10 Apr 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613)969-7400
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.A. Watkins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Watkins ( CPSO# 91446 )

Business Address:
Kingston Health Sciences Centre - KGH Site
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
QHC-Prince Edward County Memorial Hospital
403 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-1008

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 26 Aug 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA ANNE WATKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATKINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 27 Aug 2010 to 26 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 27 Aug 2011 to 26 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 27 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 27 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2014 to 01 Mar 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2014