Watson, Leah Dawn (CPSO#: 79764)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 12 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEAH DAWN WATSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2008 to 28 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2009