Watters, Suzanne Elizabeth (CPSO#: 85852)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Jan 2007 to 12 Jan 2007
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jul 2010