Watters, William Buchanan (CPSO#: 29332)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.B. Watters Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Watters ( CPSO# 29332 )

Business Address:
202 - 323 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 4A8
Phone Number: (905) 648-1431

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. K. Shirpak 105 - 323 Wilson St E Ancaster ON L9G 4A8
Date Received: 28 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018