Way, Roland Clifton Kean (CPSO#: 32249)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Cambridge Cardiac Centre 150 Hespeler Road Cambridge ON N1R 6V6
Date Received: 28 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018