Weaver, Jessie-Jean Isabelle (CPSO#: 93566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeshore Family Medicine
Suite 216
11 Victoria Street
Barrie ON  L4N 6T3
Phone: (705) 503-4111
Fax: (705) 503-5111
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jessie-Jean Weaver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Weaver ( CPSO# 93566 )

Business Address:
Lakeshore Family Medicine
Suite 216
11 Victoria Street
Barrie ON  L4N 6T3
Phone Number: (705) 503-4111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSIE-JEAN ISABELLE WEAVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEAVER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013