Weaver, Joel George Russell (CPSO#: 76239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 170
1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone: (613) 225-8433
Fax: (613) 225-3652
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J Weaver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Weaver ( CPSO# 76239 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4

Business Address:
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4

Business Address:
170 - 1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone Number: (613) 225-8433

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL GEORGE RUSSELL WEAVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEAVER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009