Weberpals, Johanne Ingrid (CPSO#: 75702)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Gynecolologic Oncology
Room 8168
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 76462
Fax: (613) 737-8828
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Weberpals Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Weberpals ( CPSO# 75702 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Division of Gynecology and Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Room 8130
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHANNE INGRID WEBERPALS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBERPALS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Oct 2000 to 27 Oct 2000
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2003