Webster, William Andrew (CPSO#: 103435)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
First Capital Health
1475 John Counter Blvd.
Suite 103
Kingston ON  K7M 0E6
Phone: (613) 531-7773
Fax: (613) 531-7774
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. Andrew Webster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Webster ( CPSO# 103435)
Dr. C. Webster ( CPSO# 68267 )

Business Address:
103-1475 John Counter Boulevard
Kingston ON  K7M 0E6
Phone Number: (613) 531-7773

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Dec 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM ANDREW WEBSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBSTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2017