Wedman, Dawn Michelle (CPSO#: 84445)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 31 May 2006 to 30 May 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 31 May 2007 to 30 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 31 May 2008 to 30 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 31 May 2009 to 30 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 31 May 2010 to 30 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 31 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012