Weekes, Andrew Napier (CPSO#: 83001)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 170
1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone: (613) 225-2525
Fax: (613) 225-3652
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew N. Weekes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Weekes ( CPSO# 83001 )

Business Address:
170 - 1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone Number: (613) 225-2525

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Site
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 24 Aug 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW NAPIER WEEKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEEKES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 24 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2010